ST NICHOLAS HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouse - providing accommodation for people in need of assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Anthony Monds | Chair | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Gardiner | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Wood-Roe | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY STIVEN | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DAVID TRAHAIR | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Esme Faith Hopkinson | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Romano | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.69k | £217.49k | £224.78k | £237.98k | £231.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £241.30k | £233.82k | £290.02k | £272.61k | £241.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
HOSPITAL OF ST. NICHOLAS (SALISBURY) CHARITY SCHEME CONFIRMATION ACT 1959 AND SCHEME OF 7 MARCH 1961, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION ON 15 JANUARY 2009 AND BY SCHEME DATED 26 APRIL 2016 as amended on 31 Jan 2019 as amended on 21 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE; (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS AND FORMER RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO FORMER RESIDENTS WHO ARE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
SALISBURY
Linked charities
- 20 September 1965 : Standard registration
- 30 January 1998 : Removed
- 30 January 1998 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLERKS OFFICE
ST. NICHOLAS HOSPITAL
5 ST. NICHOLAS ROAD
SALISBURY
SP1 2SW
- Phone:
- 01722340369
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window