DR DANIEL WILLIAMS (COMMONLY KNOWN AS DR WILLIAMS'S TRUST)

Charity number: 214926
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support Dr Williams's Library and to maintain an educated Protestant Dissenting Ministry in England and Wales.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £217,248
Total expenditure: £496,910

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 1963: Standard registration
  • 02 August 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DR WILLIAMSS CHARITY DR WILLIAMSS LIBRARY (Working name)
  • DR WILLIAMS'S TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Dr Robert Philip Pope Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Revd Dr Elaine Colechin Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Rev Dr Robert Whiteman Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Rev MARTIN NORMAN WHITELL Trustee 02 July 2020
DEPTFORD GENERAL BAPTIST CHAPEL FUND
Received: On time
PRISCILLA PEIRCE AND OTHERS
Received: On time
Rev Dr Ann Sonja Peart Trustee 03 March 2016
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN UNITARIAN ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: 13 days late
UNITARIAN HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
REVD DR MICHAEL HOPKINS Trustee 03 March 2016
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (WESSEX) TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
MARGARET IRENE KIRK Trustee 05 July 2012
THE BARNET CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
DEREK MCAULEY Trustee 05 July 2012
THE HIBBERT TRUST
Received: On time
ARTHUR MCDOUGALL FUND
Received: On time
UNITARIAN HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE JOHN GREGSON TRUST
Received: On time
PROFESSOR J CLYDE G BINFIELD Trustee 09 December 2005
None on record
Dr DOREEN JANE WILLIAMS Trustee 05 July 2001
THE RETIRED MINISTERS' AND WIDOWS' FUND
Received: On time
JEFFREY JAMES TEAGLE Trustee 03 December 1998
ESSEX HALL
Received: On time
Rev STEPHEN LEONARD COPSON Trustee 09 July 1998
THE BAPTIST HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
REGENT'S PARK COLLEGE
Received: On time
BRISTOL BAPTIST COLLEGE
Received: On time
PROFESSOR GRAYSON McCLURE DITCHFIELD Trustee 07 March 1996
None on record
WILLIAM PETER FEATHERSTONE Trustee 12 March 1983
THE FALKLANDS MARITIME HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
DESBOROUGH CORNERSTONE TRUST
Received: On time
HOWARD RICHARD HAGUE Trustee 12 March 1980
ESSEX UNITARIAN CHAPEL AND MINISTER'S HOUSE
Received: On time
ALAN ROBERT RUSTON Trustee 12 March 1975
ESSEX HALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £380.12k £302.05k £299.76k £271.32k £217.25k
Total expenditure £695.26k £413.97k £349.70k £397.24k £496.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 19 September 2024 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 19 September 2024 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 28 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 03 August 2022 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 23 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 20 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST FEBRUARY 1776
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MINISTER OF MINISTERS OF THE MEETING HOUSE AT WREXHAM OF WHICH FRANCIS BOULT WAS PASTOR
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 03 May 1963 : Standard registration
  • 02 August 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Room 263
Senate House
Malet Street
London
Phone:
02073873727