THE CHARITY OF MARY GERTRUDE PICKERING
Charity Number: 214931
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Distribution of plants at Christmas to all who have been bereaved during the current year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2016
Total income: £71
Total expenditure: £58
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Staffordshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 March 1963: Standard registration
- 14 March 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 14 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1156528 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88 | £88 | £77 | £71 | £71 | |
|
Total expenditure | £42 | £42 | £71 | £58 | £58 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 18 February 2017 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 24 June 2016 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 03 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 07 May 2014 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 28TH JUNE 1954
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SICK AND THE POOR OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STONE CHRIST CHURCH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window