W W PRESCOTT'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide accommodation for those in poverty / hardship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 June 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Stockport
- Tameside
Governance
- 04 April 1963: Standard registration
- PRESCOTT'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Debra Elliott | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Baggaley | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Brandwood | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wise | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Roy Barson | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mobbs | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Clive Larsen | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Miles Howarth | Trustee | 09 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/06/2019 | 11/06/2020 | 11/06/2021 | 11/06/2022 | 11/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.83k | £29.77k | £31.34k | £25.38k | £21.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.55k | £10.19k | £10.19k | £17.44k | £28.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Annual return | 11 June 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 June 2022 | 11 September 2024 | 519 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 June 2022 | 11 September 2024 | 519 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 June 2021 | 12 April 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 June 2021 | 12 April 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 June 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 June 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17 JANUARY 1986
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES AND PENSIONS FOR AGED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS WITH A PREFERENCE TO PERSONS SO QUALIFIED WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR WHO ARE PROTESTANT DISSENTERS. 2. IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY BENEFICIARIES INCLUDING RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
THE ANCIENT TOWNSHIPS OF BREDBURY, DENTON AND REDDISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Crescent Road
STOCKPORT
SK1 2QQ
- Phone:
- 07789915263
- Email:
- CLIVELARSEN2@ME.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window