THE FRIENDS OF UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL LEWISHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Receiving gifts, donations and bequests. All funds raised are used to provide comforts and amenities for the hospital's patients and staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
Governance
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF LEWISHAM HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.23k | £48.73k | £4.75k | £5.94k | £1.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.53k | £41.50k | £13.99k | £5.40k | £4.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 August 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 September 2021 | 39 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST OCTOBER 1957 AS AMENDED 22ND MARCH 1960, 10TH NOVEMBER 1961 AND 22ND FEBRUARY 1979
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE LEWISHAM HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window