THE MARY SLATER CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to individuals resident or organisations benefitting persons resident within 2 miles of Lichfield Cathedral who are sick and poor for convalescent holidays and for equipment relieving suffering etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 05 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RICHARD WILLIAM HENSHAW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher Key | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Fleming | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS JOSEPH ROACH | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Laura Jayne Simms | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Schafer | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Catherine Mary Wood | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daryl John Brown | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Michael Geoffrey Ipgrave | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.29k | £44.27k | £51.08k | £61.54k | £62.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.23k | £47.67k | £62.00k | £23.40k | £64.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16TH NOVEMBER 1954 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 17-9-1957. as amended on 04 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF SICK, POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF LICHFIELD OR WITHIN TWO MILES FROM THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE SAID CITY.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 8680
BURTON-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
DE14 9QB
- Phone:
- 07506284831
- Email:
- srjames@maryslater.org.uk
- Website:
-
maryslater.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window