TRINITY HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of almshouses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Powys
- Shropshire
Governance
- 24 January 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PREB RICHARD TOM SHAW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Lois Claire Beynon | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
GWLITHYN SUZANNE MORRIS | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Heather Margaret Morris | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR JOHN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
GRANT KEVIN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RT HON THE EARL OF JOHN HERBERT POWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.19k | £66.75k | £68.19k | £72.41k | £74.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.11k | £40.34k | £97.44k | £138.38k | £91.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 24 MAY 1990
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME WITHIN THE FORMER LORDSHIPS OF CLUN AND BISHOPS CASTLE,SHROPSHIRE,AND ANCIENT PARISHES OF KNIGHTON AND CHURCHSTOKE IN THE COUNTY OF POWYS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PETAN
WISTANSTOW
CRAVEN ARMS
SY7 8DG
- Phone:
- 01588672303
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window