SIGHT LOSS SHROPSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SLS's aim is to improve the quality of life of visually impaired people of all ages who live in Shropshire, Telford and Wrekin by helping visually impaired people to cope with their sight loss and the difficulties this imposes on their daily lives, raising awareness of sight loss and acting as a local champion for visually impaired people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,870 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 25 April 1963: Standard registration
- 29 September 1994: Removed
- SVAB (Previous name)
- THE SHROPSHIRE VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Brian Dapling | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Arwyn Elis Jones | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Catherine Rowlands | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER BEATRICE WYNN | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Anchan Adam Clark | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Rosemary Flint DL | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY KATHERINE DYSON | Trustee | 08 July 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.18k | £24.17k | £26.51k | £32.01k | £92.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.20k | £25.84k | £22.86k | £53.69k | £92.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.00k | £5.00k | £1.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/07/1977 AS AMENDED ON 23/07/2008 AS AMENDED ON 13/02/2013 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUL 2016 as amended on 21 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE: • TO HELP BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS RESIDENT IN SHROPSHIRE,TELFORD & WREKIN. • TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL TO OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECT.
Area of benefit
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JULY 1977
Linked charities
- 25 April 1963 : Standard registration
- 29 September 1994 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LANTERN
MEADOW FARM DRIVE
SHREWSBURY
SY1 4NG
- Phone:
- 07778 956096
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window