THE SALVATION ARMY SOCIAL WORK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of supported accommodation for homeless people Older peoples housing and support Work to help unemployed people back into work Anti-Human Trafficking work Addiction Support Services Outreach programmes and services to communities Family tracing service Frontline assistance to emergency services personnel and people affected by disasters
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£252,746,000
Donations and legacies | £25.51m | |
Charitable activities | £196.32m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.85m | |
Other | £29.07m |
Total expenditure:
£219,009,000
Raising funds | £50.00k | |
Charitable activities | £218.96m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,326,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £105,795,214 from 85 government contract(s) and £4,056,445 from 86 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £50.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £218.96m | |
Retained for future use | £33.74m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £50.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £218.96m | |
Retained for future use | £35.06m |
People

2228 Employee(s)
1 Trustee(s)
650 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 7 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 8 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 February 1963: Standard registration
- THE SALVATION ARMY SOCIAL SERVICES (Working name)
- THE SALVATION ARMY SOCIAL WORK (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE SALVATION ARMY TRUSTEE COMPANY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.07m | £160.43m | £172.71m | £201.36m | £252.75m | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.76m | £169.65m | £162.18m | £187.03m | £219.01m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £43.56m | £56.66m | £69.11m | £86.59m | £105.80m | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.23m | £4.31m | £7.68m | £6.49m | £4.06m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £26.32m | £19.46m | £21.31m | £28.80m | £25.51m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £125.83m | £138.22m | £149.73m | £169.73m | £196.32m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.62m | £2.74m | £1.50m | £1.39m | £1.85m | |
|
Income - Other | £298.00k | £5.00k | £164.00k | £1.44m | £29.07m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £4.21m | £1.02m | £1.17m | £1.42m | £871.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £163.01m | £169.60m | £162.13m | £186.98m | £218.96m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £750.00k | £50.00k | £50.00k | £50.00k | £50.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £170.00k | £155.00k | £178.00k | £140.00k | £167.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £50.00k | £50.00k | £50.00k | £50.00k | £50.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £202.22m | £202.12m | £200.39m | £197.07m | £192.38m | |
|
Long-term investments | £136.64m | £129.04m | £152.97m | £163.41m | £164.74m | |
|
Other assets | £53.69m | £53.50m | £61.08m | £61.38m | £102.66m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£5.05m | -£2.02m | -£4.19m | -£2.86m | -£2.85m | |
|
Total liabilities | £55.48m | £64.84m | £60.58m | £43.61m | £46.98m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 30TH JANUARY 1891, SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 26TH MARCH 1969 AND SALVATION ARMY ACT 1980
Charitable objects
(1) RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS SUFFERING DISTRESS INCAPACITY OR OLD AGE. (2) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. (3) TRAINING IN CHRISTIAN AND MORAL PRINCIPLES. (4) ASSISTANCE OF THOSE IN NEED OF PROTECTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ALEXANDER KING BEQUEST
- ALFRED HARTWELL BEQUEST
- ANONYMOUS (NAIRN)
- ARTHUR JAMES MIDDLETON BEQUEST
- BLACKMORE MISSIONS FUND
- C J AND E J MELBOURNE BEQUEST
- E A TODD BEQUEST
- E CECIL JONES BEQUEST
- EDWIN DALTON BEQUEST
- FREDERICK JOHN VARLEY BEQUEST
- G T HOPKINS BEQUEST
- GEHLE TRUST
- GEORGE BURRILL BEQUEST
- HENRY BRODERICK BEQUEST
- HOLMES WRIGHT BEQUEST
- ISOBELLA BARR
- J B CRICHTON BEQUEST
- J B STYRING BEQUEST
- JAMES BENNETT AITKEN BEQUEST
- JAMES WHITE (STOCKTON)
- JAMES WHITE (WSM)
- JANE P WEBSTER BEQUEST
- JOHN GAUNT BEQUEST
- JOHN TAYLOR GREY BEQUEST
- MABEL MARSHALL BEQUEST
- MARION L BUCHANAN BEQUEST
- MARY JANE FOWLER BEQUEST
- MISS E C D FRAZER BEQUEST
- MISS E E STEPHENSON BEQUEST
- MISS E J BULLER BROWNE
- MISS M B HILL BEQUEST
- MISS M FALCONER BEQUEST
- MISS MARGARET LARGE BEQUEST
- MISS MARGARET TULLOCH BEQUEST
- MRS CAPEL MORRIS BEQUEST
- MRS E KENNEDY BEQUEST
- MRS E W M ANDERSON BEQUEST
- MRS G E MARCUS BEQUEST
- MRS MAGGIE DONALD RANKIN BEQUEST
- MRS ROBINSON BEQUEST
- RICHARD CORY TRUST
- SARIA SEARE BEQUEST
- TERESA FUND
- W F C JUDSON BEQUEST
- W J FREETH BEQUEST
- WILLIAM BEATTIE BEQUEST
- WILLIAM PRESCOTT BEQUEST
- WILLIAM WILSON BEQUEST
- 13 February 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SALVATION ARMY
1 CHAMPION PARK
LONDON
SE5 8FJ
- Phone:
- 02073674501
- Email:
- info@salvationarmy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window