Financial history PUDLESTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 215181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.53k £21.46k £24.31k £9.33k £17.98k
Total expenditure £20.32k £15.14k £15.11k £19.63k £9.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.23k £10.67k N/A N/A