Trustees PUDLESTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 215181

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Rupert Dominic Anton | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Graham Paul Bailey | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Catherine Wells | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Sellers | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Williams | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL BAILEY | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Hayton-Lee | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Village | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Jean Connop | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.