FRIENDS SERVICE COUNCIL
Charity Number: 215230
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 27 January 1965: Standard registration
- 15 December 2003: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
UNKNOWN
Charitable objects
LINKING UP AND CO-ORDINATING ALL EXISTING WORK ABROAD AND OF FACILITATING AN ADVANCE IN THE DELIVERY OF THE QUAKER MESSAGE AS THE WAY OPEN THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
Linked charities
- CONSTANCE IDA SMITH FUND
- DOROTHEA SIMMONS TRUST
- FRIENDS MISSIONARY STUDENTS MAINTENANCE FUND
- GEORGE STURGE'S GIFT
- JAMES WHITEHEAD LEGACY
- JOHN HORNIMAN TRUSTS FOR FRIENDS FOREIGN MISSION ASSOCIATION AND OTHER PURPOSES
- THE 1963 EMERGENCY RELIEF GIFT
- TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNEXION WITH THE FRIENDS SERVICE COUNCIL
Governing document
SCHEME OF 28 MAY 1954, AS AMENDED ON 14TH NOVEMBER 2003 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF S75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
PROVIDING RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR MISSIONARIES EMPLOYED BY FRIENDS SERVICE COUNCIL (AND THEIR FAMILIES).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
- 27 January 1965 : Standard registration
- 15 December 2003 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window