TRELEWIS O A P WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 215286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Arrange various coach Outings to places of interest. Organise various social events eg. concerts, bingo social evenings, luncheon club, Christmas Dinner with entertainment. Provide transport via minibus to events. Organise short break holidays.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £29,211
Total expenditure: £29,907

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Merthyr Tydfil

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 March 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TRELEWIS OAP ASSOCIATION COMMITTEE (Working name)
  • TRELEWIS OAP WELFARE COMMITTEE (Working name)
  • TRELEWIS O A P BUILDING AND WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jillian Cowles Trustee 06 June 2016
None on record
Elaine Staples Trustee 06 June 2016
None on record
JEAN LOVE Trustee 26 October 2011
None on record
JUNE WHITCOMBE Trustee 26 October 2011
None on record
IRFONA PRIDE Trustee
None on record
AUDREY ANNE WILTSHIRE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.01k £11.66k £13.75k £37.44k £29.21k
Total expenditure £30.14k £11.62k £14.89k £36.79k £29.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £500 £1.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 ST. MARY STREET
TRELEWIS
TREHARRIS
CF46 6AL
Phone:
01443411597
Website:

No information available