STAFFORDSHIRE UNITED SERVICES AID FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Finacial assistance to serving and exService men and women living in or having connection with Staffordshire, and their dependents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 05 March 1963: Standard registration
- STAFFORDSHIRE WAR MEMORIAL UNITED SERVICES AID FUND (Previous name)
- STAFFORDSHIRE WAR MEMORIAL UNITED SERVICES AID TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN JAMES DAVIS MBE MA | Chair |
|
||||||
Major Douglas William Craig | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sqn Ldr Martin Dennis Green | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Catherine Anne Parkhill | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ERIC HERMAN TAYLOR | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIGADIER BARRY ARTHUR CHARLES SMITH CBE TD DL | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LT COLONEL ERIC CONWAY DALE OBE | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
George Henry Steele | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.40k | £12.24k | £12.63k | £14.10k | £13.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.11k | £13.45k | £12.87k | £30.47k | £21.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23/01/1987 AS AMENDED ON 17/08/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY SCH OF THE FOLLOWING PERSONS AS ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS: (A) NATIVES OF THE COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE WHO ARE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED IN ANY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN (B) PERSONS WHO ARE SERVING OR HAVE SEVED IN ANY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN IN THE SAID COUNTY. (C) THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS. (D) THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE DIED. (E) INHABITANTS OF THE SAID COUNTY WHO ARE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED IN ANY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN. (F) THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS. (G) THE DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED PERSONS WHO HAD SERVED IN ANY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN AND WHO, AT THE DATE OF DEATH, WERE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID COUNTY.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Collegiate Church Of St. Mary
Parish Office
St. Mary's Mews
St Mary's Place
Stafford
ST16 2AR
- Phone:
- 01785212680
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window