CHARITY OF CHARLES PEARCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Occasional poor relief.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

No information available
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- East Sussex
Governance
- 22 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62 | £63 | £64 | £65 | £67 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVE 08 MARCH 1882
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE SAID PARISH OF SALEHURST AND ITS INHABITANTS THEREOF FOR THE TIME BEING AS THE VICAR MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SALEHURST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cherra
Langham Road
Robertsbridge
TN32 5DT
- Phone:
- 01580880427
- Email:
- r.a.cowap@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window