Financial history SUTTON-UNDER-BRAILES CHARITIES

Charity Number: 215345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £82 £85 £87 £87 £88
Total expenditure £100 £0 £225 £100 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A