ESSEX PROVINCIAL CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 215349
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS TO MASONS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019

Total income: £68,768
Total expenditure: £82,096

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 March 1963: Standard registration
  • 19 August 2015: Funds received from 257171 THE ABBEYGATE LODGE NO 4219 MASONIC BENEVOLENT ASS...
  • 02 June 2020: Funds transferred to 1185801 ESSEX PROVINCIAL CHARITY FUND
  • 02 June 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ESSEX PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £247.46k £170.45k £164.69k £79.29k £68.77k
Total expenditure £215.60k £174.39k £172.89k £72.81k £82.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 May 2020 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 09 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2017 01 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 01 February 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2016 04 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 04 April 2017 On Time