Accounts and annual returns THE CHARITY OF THE REVEREND GEORGE WALKER HALL FOR ORGANIST

Charity number: 215370
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required