Financial history THE SALT HILL PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 215385
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.22k £17.18k £16.91k £17.14k £16.77k
Total expenditure £26.54k £53.75k £18.84k £21.33k £22.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A