THE LLAY ESTATE

Charity number: 215406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes donations to Charities within the Parish and the Deanery to help the poor and disabled.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £6,598
Total expenditure: £7,100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 1963: Standard registration
  • 10 July 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST MARYS PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (Working name)
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Gilburt Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Eric Christopher Inger Schofield Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Patricia Lynne Jones Trustee 20 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY ON THE HILL, CHESTER
Received: On time
Helen Mary Brophy Trustee 03 April 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY ON THE HILL, CHESTER
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £6.28k £5.84k £5.95k £6.49k £6.60k
Total expenditure £6.40k £5.00k £5.80k £6.50k £7.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 11 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 28 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 09 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 21 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 19 JULY 1889
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF ST MARY-ON-THE-HILL
Registration history
  • 25 February 1963 : Standard registration
  • 10 July 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
3 The Paddocks
Long Lane
Waverton
CHESTER
CH3 7RB
Phone:
01244749112
Website:

No information available