THE HEATHCOTE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In the Parish of Winster - To assist the relief of the sick and the poor and furthering the education of scholars . To maintain the graves of the Heathcote Family in Winster Churchyard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 31 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosamond Louise Hession | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
BRIAN LONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
SANDRA PURSLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JOHN HEATHCOTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
ROBERT DONALD GREATOREX | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
GILBERT HEATHCOTE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.32k | £3.24k | £3.15k | £3.49k | £3.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.65k | £3.87k | £3.01k | £3.62k | £5.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 JULY 1937
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE WELFARE OF THE INHABITANTS, IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF THE SICK AND NEEDY, THE HELP OF THE WINSTER NURSING ASSOCIATION AND OTHER NURSING OR HOSPITAL SERVICES IN THE DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
WINSTER AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Thornton Mews
St Elphins Park
Darley Dale
Matlock
Derbyshire
DE4 2RN
- Phone:
- 01629736794
- Email:
- jackie.winster@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window