Financial history THE NATIONAL SMALL-BORE RIFLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 215468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.93m £1.92m £2.01m £2.59m £1.67m
Total expenditure £2.96m £1.94m £2.12m £3.30m £1.84m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.56k £86.34k £11.27k £6.13k £19.85k
Income - Other trading activities £1.91m £874.54k £1.08m £1.67m £872.06k
Income - Charitable activities £919.11k £665.06k £697.84k £844.54k £728.20k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.15k £0 £2.47k £0 £5.82k
Income - Other £95.96k £293.74k £218.71k £67.75k £42.22k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.04m £825.46k £752.21k £1.07m £1.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £630.45k
Expenditure - Governance £25.19k £0 £0 £0 £44.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.91m £1.12m £1.36m £2.24m £0