VICTOR MANN TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Give financial help to the elderly residents within the Wallsend Area of North Tyneside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 13 February 1963: Standard registration
- WALLSEND CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel John Huscroft | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Cruddas Cllr | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lott Cllr | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Barry Montague Cllr | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.76k | £122.52k | £23.26k | £25.88k | £78.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.89k | £28.57k | £20.14k | £21.66k | £24.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD FEBRUARY 1956
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTIONOF THE WELFARE AND COMFORT OF THE AGED POOR INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF WALLSEND AND FOR THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR THE AGED AND POOR INHABITANTS OF THE SAID BOROUGH.
Area of benefit
WALLSEND
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTH TYNESIDE COUNCIL
16 THE SILVERLINK NORTH
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE27 0BY
- Phone:
- 01916437006
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window