CHARITY OF CHARLES CLEMENT WALKER (COMMONLY KNOWN AS THE WALKER TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants in the areas of education and training and health and disability to Shropshire residents and projects. Grants are made to organisations and individuals. Education and training grants may be for courses undertaken both within or outside the area of benefit. Projects must operate and provide benefit within the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 29 July 1964: Standard registration
- THE WALKER TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Crackett | Chair | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Williams | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
VINCE HUNT | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
LADY LYDIA FORESTER | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY REYNOLDS | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLIN PATON-SMITH | Trustee | 30 January 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.81k | £136.48k | £136.48k | £155.87k | £172.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.82k | £147.29k | £147.29k | £165.54k | £121.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 July 2022 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 July 2022 | 154 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT SHREWSBURY ON THE 8 MAY 1897 AND SCHEME OF THE HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE OF THE 14 MAY 1956
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME TO ALL OR SUCH OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES AS MY TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK BENEFICIAL VIZ:- 1) IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OR IN OR TOWARDS MAINTENANCE OF ANY HOSPITAL, INFIRMARY, CONVALESCENT HOME OR OTHER INSTITUTION HAVING ITS OBJECT THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OR PROMOTING CONVALESCENCE. 2) THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL OR SURGICAL AID OR APPLIANCES. 3) ANY INSTITUTION FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND EDUCATION OF ORPHANS. 4) THE PROVISION OF SUCH MEANS OF EDUCATION AS ARE NOT FOR THE TIME BEING PROVIDED BY IMPERIAL OR LOCAL TAXATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 BREIDDEN WAY
BAYSTON HILL
SHREWSBURY
SY3 0LN
- Phone:
- 01743873866
- Email:
- edward.hewitt@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window