GRANTHAM'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides housing for elderly (aged 55 or over) people in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Kate Storr | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs Sue Campbell | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs Patricia Taylor | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Mrs Charlotte Croft | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
ronald shepherd cllr | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev Sheena CLEATON | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.50k | £20.95k | £19.91k | £22.97k | £28.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.95k | £18.36k | £24.13k | £29.28k | £26.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 21 OCTOBER 1985, 11 NOVEMBER 1994, AND 3 SEPTEMBER 2004. MEMORANDUM OF AMENDMENT MADE 8 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE AND WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGHS OF CLEETHORPES AND GREAT GRIMSBY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
103 Louth Road
GRIMSBY
DN33 2JU
- Phone:
- 07810871074
- Email:
- granthamalmshouses@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window