THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Examination, Certification and Membership body- Charity remained dormant throughout the year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 January 1963: Standard registration
- 30 September 2013: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 30 September 2013: Funds transferred to 1125949 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR PUBLIC HEALTH
- THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF HEALTH (Working name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39m | £1.15m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.33m | £1.21m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.35m | £1.10m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £41.57k | £37.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £20 | £18.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.26m | £1.05m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £53.17k | £147.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £13.52k | £8.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 29 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 12 July 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 28 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 AUGUST 1888 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26 JULY 1955, 29 JUNE 1982, 28H APRIL 1987, 23 APRIL 1996, 25 MAY 2000 AND 25 JUNE 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH RELATED SCIENCES IN ALL OR ANY OF THEIR BRANCHES AND THE DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE RELATING THERETO.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Linked charities
- 31 January 1963 : Standard registration
- 30 September 2013 : Removed
- 30 September 2013 : Asset transfer out
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window