CHARITY OF RICHARD CRANDALL FOR THE POOR OF LEIGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for village charitable organisations and the poor
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 19 February 1963: Standard registration
- CRANDALL TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Clay | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Philip Britain | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.92k | £3.03k | £2.49k | £2.70k | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.45k | £2.77k | £2.60k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2024 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF RICHARD CRANDALL PROVED 7 JULY 1932 (U.V. 254, P. 387) AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 1997 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
SEE GOVERNING DOCUMENT FOR FULL DETAILS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LEIGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOMBERS COTTAGE
LOWER GREEN
LEIGH
TONBRIDGE
TN11 8RU
- Phone:
- 01732832714
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window