FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fuel donations for over 65 year olds in village of Honington Financial crisis support for local residents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- 08 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV CANON ELIZABETH SALLY FOGDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LINDA ANNE HOWE | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN REEVE | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN WILLIAM HOWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN PATTERSON-PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.53k | £4.48k | £4.43k | £4.32k | £4.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.02k | £5.01k | £5.15k | £8.34k | £6.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13 NOVEMBER 1967 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR IN THE PARISH OF HUNINGTON
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HUNINGTON
Linked charities
- 08 March 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARLEQUIN COTTAGE
CHURCH ROAD
HONINGTON
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP31 1RG
- Phone:
- 01359269142
- Email:
- LINDAHE1502@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window