ELIZABETH HALL FOR WIDOWS

Charity number: 215636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CHARITY PROVIDES ACCOMMODATION FOR ELDERLY (OLD) PEOPLE IN 4 COTTAGES UNDER ONE ROOF AT NORMANTON-ON-TRENT, NEWARK, NORTH NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, NG23 6RQ. THE CHARITY LETS ITS 32.83 ACRES OF ENDOWMENT FARM LAND TO A TENANT FARMER WHO CULTIVATES THE LAND AND PAYS AN ANNUAL RENT OF 3840.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £25,768
Total expenditure: £30,672

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 March 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GACHES CHARITY AND OTHERS (Previous name)
  • MARY MELLER (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR ANDY MARTIN Chair
None on record
John Vessey Machin Trustee 19 November 2019
None on record
ROBERT BROUGH Trustee 15 December 2016
None on record
MARGARET MARTIN Trustee 20 February 2013
None on record
JULIE RUSHBY Trustee 16 November 2012
None on record
PAT WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.26k £25.48k £25.22k £23.83k £25.77k
Total expenditure £13.80k £13.33k £44.52k £15.76k £30.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 13 OCTOBER 1916 AND 13 JUNE 1972
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF POOR WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF NORMANTON ON TRENT EITHER IN GIFTS IN KIND OR GRANTS OF MONEY.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF NORMANTON ON TRENT
Registration history
  • 11 March 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
SCARTHINGMOOR MILL
NORTH ROAD
WESTON
NEWARK
NOTTS
NG23 6TF
Phone:
0777 2694424
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available