SUNNYLEE ESTATE

Charity number: 215657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides accomodation in 4 almshouses for local elderly people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £9,356
Total expenditure: £1,542

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Hoare Trustee 18 November 2022
None on record
Paul Carter Trustee 18 November 2022
None on record
Mary Vickers Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
MIRELLA MOXON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.03k £9.26k £9.29k £9.27k £9.36k
Total expenditure £4.73k £2.62k £8.15k £3.17k £1.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 December 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 March 2021 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 Mellor Close
OTLEY
LS21 2FB
Phone:
01943 462875
Website:

No information available