LLANWERN VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Village Hall in Llanwern Village gifted to the village by Viscountess Rhondda for the use of the community. It has a Board of Trustees and a Management Committee who look after the day by day running of the Hall, see to any repairs and coordinate bookings. We are used for health, social, educational and general welfare of the Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newport City
Governance
- 12 February 1968: Standard registration
- LLANWERN INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Llanwern Community Council | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.21k | £5.32k | £17.38k | £872 | £17.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £561 | £4.27k | £17.59k | £950 | £15.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2023 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2023 | 730 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2023 | 1095 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 6TH DECEMBER 1947 AS AMENDED 15 FEBRUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL OR INSTITUTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LLANWERN.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LLANWERN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Redwood
Milton Hill
Llanwern
NEWPORT
Gwent
NP18 2DU
- Phone:
- 07380537328
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window