LEGATE'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 215712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Assists those in conditions of need, hardship or distress in the Borough of Christchurch by awarding one off grants towards specific items or a monthly allowance (currently ?8.00 per week for an individual and ?10.00 per week for a couple)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £11,053
Total expenditure: £369

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TARA JANE FOX Chair 06 June 2011
CHRISTCHURCH SPORTS AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Susan Margaret Spittle Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
JOHN ALASTAIR GEORGE HOARE Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
COUNCILLOR MRS TRISH JAMIESON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.76k £9.39k £10.76k £10.52k £11.05k
Total expenditure £5.40k £4.63k £5.40k £6.27k £369
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 May 2024 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Bridge Street
CHRISTCHURCH
Dorset
BH23 1ED
Phone:
01202483081
Website:

No information available