INSTITUTE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 02 March 1964: Standard registration
- 30 July 1998: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION APPROVED 31ST MARCH 1932 AS AMENDED 21 MAY 1955, MANY OCCASIONS SINCE THIS DATE, AND 15 MAY 1992 AND 28TH OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE SCIENCE OF LABOUR MANAGEMENT, INCLUDING INDUSTRIAL WELFARE WORK, STAFF MANAGEMENT AND EMPLOYMENT ADMINISTRATION AND TO FOSTER AND MAINTAIN INVESTIGATIONS AND RESEARCH INTO THE BEST MEANS AND METHODS OF APPLYING THE SCIENCE OF LABOUR MANAGEMENT, INCLUDING INDUSTRIAL WELFARE WORK, STAFF MANAGEMENT AND EMPLOYMENT ADMINISTRATION AND TO ENCOURAGE, EXTEND, INCREASE, DISSEMINATE AND PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE AND THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION AND IDEAS IN REGARD TO ALL QUESTIONS RELATING THERETO OR CONNECTED THEREWITH
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.