DAME DOROTHY LEGH'S CHARITY

Charity number: 215827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of poverty and helping religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £20,640
Total expenditure: £16,532

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Salford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF DAME DOROTHY LEGH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr THOMAS LEONARD FREEMAN Chair 09 November 2017
None on record
Stanley Eames Trustee 10 November 2022
None on record
Stuart Braddock Trustee 04 July 2019
None on record
GAYNA O'NEILL Trustee
None on record
Christine Mary Margaret WALSH Trustee
None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN BARRATT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.44k £16.88k £18.04k £22.70k £20.64k
Total expenditure £15.86k £13.43k £12.24k £13.36k £16.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 May 2024 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 18 DECEMBER 1858 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 25 JANUARY 1876 AND 29 JUNE 1905
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MINISTER OF ELLENBROOK CHAPEL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 16 April 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
15 Rands Clough Drive
Boothstown
Worsley
Manchester
M28 1HJ
Phone:
01617907848
Website:

No information available