CHARITY OF THOMAS COX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
There are 5 Trustees who meet yearly. Over the years the income has been used in differing ways, as cash gifts, usable gifts and in recent years Christmas Hampers for deserving causes in the local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 09 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS RAYMOND JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David William Murfin | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Raymond Asher | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS CHADWICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICK JOHN DOWLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265 | £361 | £405 | £369 | £263 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.29k | £0 | £277 | £180 | £250 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 JULY 1902
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF PARISH OF BRAILSFORD OR OF SUCH DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS IN WAYS MOST CONDUCIVE TO FORMATION OF PROVIDENCE HABITS 1. SUPPLY OF CLOTHES, BEDDING, TOOLS, AND IN SICKNESS FOOD ETC. 2. TEMPORARY RELIEF, LOANS OR OTHERWISE, IN CASES OF LOSS OR DESTITUTION.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRAILSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
87 THE PLAIN
BRAILSFORD
ASHBOURNE
DE6 3BR
- Phone:
- 07305 593967
- Email:
- Patdowling53@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window