Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF JOHN CAME ADMINISTERED BY THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF CORDWAINERS

Charity number: 216006
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2007 29 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2006 31 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2005 09 June 2006 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2004 31 May 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 Not Required