THE BRITISH FIRE SERVICES ASSOCIATION MEMBERS WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 216011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To assist necessitious members, ex members and dependants of the British Fire Services Association. To look after the welfare of same by visits, telephone and electronic communications and by letter.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £24,298
Total expenditure: £22,296

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 July 1964: Standard registration
  • 30 October 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE BRITISH FIRE SERVICES ASSOCIATION WIDOWS ORPHANS AND BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER WILLIAM THOMAS MILLS Fbfsa Chair
EDITH ELIZABETH AND WILLIAM GEORGE MILLS MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Nigel Sheridan Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
ROBERT DAVIES Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
George Halstead Trustee 15 June 1990
None on record
VERNON MICHAEL FISHER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.01k £22.26k £25.32k £21.25k £24.30k
Total expenditure £23.92k £25.36k £22.59k £22.90k £22.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED 1 JANUARY 1951
Charitable objects
TO MAKE GRANTS TO THE DEPENDANTS OF FORMER MEMBERS OF THE PROFESSIONAL FIRE BRIGADES ASSOCIATION WHO AT THE TIME OF DEATH WERE MEMBERS OF THE BRITISH FIRE SERVICES ASSOCIATION AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COMMITTEE OF THE MANAGEMENT OF THE SPECIAL FUND.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 23 July 1964 : Standard registration
  • 30 October 2017 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
9 Home Farm Close
Wray
LANCASTER
LA2 8RG
Phone:
01524221141
Website:

No information available