CHAWNER ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 216025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide low cost housing to the poor & needy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £12,025
Total expenditure: £23,493

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CHAWNER ALMSHOUSES MARCHINGTON STAFFORDSHIRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian William Morgan Chair 10 February 2016
None on record
Judith Mary Hope Lewis Trustee 14 January 2020
None on record
Christopher Charles Lewis Trustee 14 January 2020
None on record
Christina Mann Trustee 14 January 2020
None on record
Stuart Patrick Davies Trustee 14 January 2020
None on record
Andrew Frederick Boultby Trustee 10 February 2016
None on record
MICHAEL MARRISON Trustee 29 November 2015
None on record
MICHAEL JOHN MARRISON Trustee 29 October 2015
None on record
ANNE MARRISON Trustee 29 October 2015
None on record
PETER JOHN WAINWRIGHT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.78k £11.58k £11.92k £11.27k £12.03k
Total expenditure £6.06k £3.05k £50.04k £3.86k £23.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k £1.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 05 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 01 August 2024 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 20 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Woodland Views
Marchington
UTTOXETER
ST14 8NF
Phone:
01283820899
Email:
No information available