THE AUBREY ALMSHOUSES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides housing for three single women over the age of 60 from the City of Hereford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 17 April 1963: Standard registration
- 02 November 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 02 November 2017: Funds transferred to 218738 HEREFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.63k | £1.15k | £808 | £670 | £8.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08k | £2.35k | £7.21k | £4.55k | £6.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME SEALED 7TH APRIL 1959 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 25 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENACE OF ALMSHOUSES AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR WIDOWS OR SINGLE WOMEN OF GOOD CHARACTER AND OF NOT LESS THAN SIXTY YEARS OF AGE, WHO, (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS) ARE RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF HEREFORD AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
CITY OF HEREFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window