FRIENDS OF KETTERING ART GALLERY AND MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO FURTHER THE WORK OF KETTERING ART GALLERY AND MUSEUM AND TO HELP MAKE THEM MORE WIDELY KNOWN, UNDERSTOOD AND ENJOYED; TO HELP STRENGTHEN THE COLLECTIONS OF THE ART GALLERY AND MUSEUM BY GIFT AND PURCHASE, CONSERVATION AND CATALOGUING; TO PROMOTE CULTURAL AND ARTISTIC ACTIVITIES IN THE KETTERING AREA, INCLUDING ORGANISING MEETINGS, VISITS AND TALKS ON RELEVANT SUBJECTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
82 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 28 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Badger | Chair | 11 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Anne Marie B Lee | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Staveley | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Brown | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Meninick | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dez Dell | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Luck | Trustee | 19 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maura Bright | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hatton | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA LEWIS | Trustee | 09 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.84k | £29.83k | £13.03k | £18.22k | £36.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.49k | £8.23k | £17.79k | £17.13k | £31.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCT 1956 AS AMENDED ON 22 JAN 2003 AS AMENDED ON 28 APR 2011 AS AMENDED ON 20 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 16 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2021 AS AMENDED ON 01 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF KETTERING ART GALLERY AND MUSEUM. TO AID BY GIFT AND PURCHASE THE COLLECTION OF THE ART GALLERY AND MUSEUM. TO PROMOTE ARTISTIC AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
KETTERING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Headlands
KETTERING
Northamptonshire
NN15 7HP
- Phone:
- 07867 457138
- Email:
- info@friendskagam.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window