Financial history CASTLE CAEREINION UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 216106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.58k £5.61k £5.63k £8.26k £7.06k
Total expenditure £5.64k £5.84k £5.59k £5.47k £5.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A