LINCOLN VEGA CLUB FOR THE BLIND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social contact for blind/partially sighted members in the form of regular meetings, days out, a holiday and a Christmas meal and party.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 05 February 1963: Standard registration
- 14 November 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 14 November 2018: Funds transferred to 209617 THE GUIDE DOGS FOR THE BLIND ASSOCIATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.19k | £16.19k | £7.48k | £14.06k | £5.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.20k | £21.20k | £14.14k | £14.78k | £11.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 06 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 21 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED NOVEMBER 1944 AS AMENDED 9 NOVEMBER 1992 AND 3 NOVEMBER 1993.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ENTERTAINMENT AND EDUCATIONAL INTERESTS AND OUTINGS AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES FOR MEMBERS WHO SHALL BE REGISTERED BLIND AND PARTIALLY-SIGHTED PERSONS OF THE CITY OF LINCOLN AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICT BY THE PROVISION OF A CLUB.
Area of benefit
LINCOLN AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window