Financial history ALL SAINTS PARISH ROOMS (CHEADLE HULME)

Charity number: 216155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £45.28k £23.15k £27.67k £49.00k £51.18k
Total expenditure £28.59k £31.37k £37.27k £43.80k £49.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.90k £2.32k N/A £1.00k