CUDDRA WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE CARRY OUT MONTHLY MEETINGS TO INFORM OUR MEMBERS OF ACTIVITIES AVAILABLE TO THEM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Cornwall
Governance
- 15 August 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Harvey Keep | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Tomlinson | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth McCorquodale | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Rowe | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Denise Crockett | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lorraine ALLEN | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA BARRETT | Trustee | 20 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.10k | £22.17k | £10.58k | £9.15k | £10.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.94k | £21.20k | £12.65k | £19.56k | £11.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £16.26k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULS
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE.
Area of benefit
HOLMBUSH DISTRICT IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF ST. AUSTELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Wheal Regent Park
Carlyon Bay
ST. AUSTELL
PL25 3SP
- Phone:
- 01726814612
- Email:
- juliakeep@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window