Trustees THOMAS SPOONER

Charity number: 216204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Hinsley Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Timothy Hirst Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Simon Key Trustee 08 September 2020
SEETHING AND MUNDHAM VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Stuart Lawn Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
JOANNA SERGEANT Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record