THE RAYNE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 216291
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Rayne Foundation works to build bridges connecting people and communities and by bringing them together to create a more cohesive society.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2017

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 September 1965: Standard registration
  • 18 March 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 18 March 2019: Funds transferred to 1179912 THE RAYNE FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2013 30/11/2014 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017
Total gross income £1.41m £1.46m £1.47m £1.75m £3.14m
Total expenditure £4.43m £1.80m £2.07m £2.16m £2.51m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £82.71k £57.90k £56.19k £65.11k £305.35k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.33m £1.40m £1.42m £1.68m £2.84m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.28m £1.68m £1.66m £2.02m £2.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £138.12k £149.73k
Expenditure - Governance £33.71k £27.34k £25.41k £344.03k £68.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.95m £1.25m £1.42m £1.68m £1.66m
Expenditure - Investment management £112.91k £92.32k £138.09k £138.12k £149.73k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £250.00k £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/11/2013 30/11/2014 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £80.46m £93.93m £108.53m £79.82m £85.44m
Other assets £5.41m £4.35m £3.83m £5.05m £9.01m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £4.08m £2.63m £2.01m £1.39m £1.61m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2017 16 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 28 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2016 19 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 21 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2015 28 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 01 July 2016 On Time