Accounts and annual returns LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF WANTAGE HOSPITAL

Charity number: 216359
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2006 25 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 25 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2005 20 January 2006 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 20 January 2006 51 days late
Annual return 31 January 2004 31 January 2005 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2004 31 January 2005 62 days late