CARDIFF MUSICAL THEATRE
Charity number: 216396
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2004
Total income: £8,364
Total expenditure: £7,345
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 06 November 1963: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- CMT (Working name)
- CARDIFF MUNICIPAL MUSICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- CARDIFF MUNICIPAL OPERATIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- CARDIFF MUSICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 05 July 2005 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED NOVEMBER 1962 AS AMENDED 10 OCTOBER 1979 AND ON 22 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER MUSIC AND THE ARTS FOR EDUCATION AND PHILANTHROPIC PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window