Trustees GEDNEY UNITED CHARITIES
Charity number: 216410

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY DESMOND HICKS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Laurence Marchant | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Dean Blackbourn | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Carey-Slater | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andy Parks | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN HARGREAVES | Trustee | 12 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
JILL DUFFEY | Trustee | 12 March 2006 |
|
|
||||
David Mann | Trustee | 12 July 1987 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.