Accounts and annual returns MIDDLEWICH CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 216445
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2006 17 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2005 13 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2004 23 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 Not Required